HI SB3042 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for its efforts to mitigate and control two-lined spittlebug infestations in the State. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 468) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3065) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2781) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2532 (Same As) 2020-05-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.