HI SB3040 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends annual reporting requirement for the Department of the Attorney General concerning firearms concealed carry licenses.
Title
Relating To Firearms Reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2635) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2351 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.