HI SB3040 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (H) The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (H) The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from the rental motor vehicle surcharge tax, vehicles that are rented by a car-sharing organization to members of its membership program on an hourly basis for up to six hours per day per vehicle. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Rental Motor Vehicle and Tour Vehicle Surcharge Tax; Car-Sharing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | (H) The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-19-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 404) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2597) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2121) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |