HI SB304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 at 2:00pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 at 2:00pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Maternal Mortality Review Panel within the Department of Health to conduct a comprehensive review of maternal deaths that have occurred in the State. (SB304 HD1)
Title
Maternal Mortality Review Panel; Department of Health; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 at 2:00pm in conference room 229. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 8:15AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1599), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-04-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1168) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2015-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-15 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 791) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 403) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |