HI SB3025 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the immediate towing of parked vehicles that are not properly registered, do not display valid safety inspection stickers, or are otherwise illegally parked.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:30PM in conference room 225. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3025&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3025_.HTM |