HI SB3024 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the sale of video games that contain a system of further purchasing to consumers under 21 years of age. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 391) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2615) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2018-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-02-08SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara.
2018-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-26SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2018-01-26SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2686 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback