HI SB3023 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for fiscal year 2014-2015 for the research, development, and marketing of ulu. (SB3023 HD1)
Title
Agriculture; Ulu; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 9:29AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-14 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 711). |
2014-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Wooley, Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Awana, Matsumoto. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 643). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1587-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Hashem, Woodson, Ward. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (5). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1070-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-13-14 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-14 at 10:00am. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Monday, 03-10-14 10:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 348) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2635) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2118) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |