HI SB3019 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to develop administrative rules to allow for traditional Hawaiian farming systems and tiny homes in association with the farming systems on lands designated as conservation districts. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Traditional Hawaiian Practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |