HI SB3018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary to implement a payment plan program that offers any person who is unable to pay any court-ordered fines, fees, surcharges, costs, or monetary assessments the option of entering into a payment plan. Prohibits the courts from taking certain actions against a person solely because of that person's inability to pay. Reinstates driver's licenses that were suspended for nonpayment under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDC/TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2574 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3018&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB3018_.HTM |