HI SB3012 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the corporate income tax rate by twenty-five per cent. Allocates $5,000,000 of corporate income tax revenues to the HI growth initiative until 1/1/2022. (SD1)
Title
Corporate Income Tax; HI Growth Initiative
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2667 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5