HI SB301 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Disallows dividends paid deduction for real estate investment trusts. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2019. Sunsets 12/31/2023. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation Of Real Estate Investment Trusts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
2019-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
2019-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Hashem, Kong, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka voting no (7) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 134).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 309.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Takumi, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Say voting no (5) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2121), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-13HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-03-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-01HousePass First Reading
2019-02-28HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-20Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-28-19.
2019-02-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-20SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB475 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback