HI SB3009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the sale of two-stroke engines and new machines and vehicles operated by a two-stroke engine, effective January 1, 2024. Establishes the electric engine loan program and revolving fund. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Two-stroke Engines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1901 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3009&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3009_.HTM |