HI SB3008 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Anaergia Inc. with the development of facilities for renewable non-fossil fuel energy production on Maui. (SB3008 HD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Renewable Energy; Anaergia Inc. ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:35PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Ihara Member. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ing, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1589-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka excused (2). |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-13-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 346) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Green, Ige, Ihara, Kouchi . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Ruderman, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2634) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2191 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).