HI SB300 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of assault in the second degree as it applies to medical professionals by expanding the types of medical services providers protected under this offense. Clarifies that the offense of assault in the second degree does not apply to patients receiving medical services at the time injury to a medical services provider occurs. (SD1)
Title
Assault in the Second Degree; Medical Services Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room CR414. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |