HI SB2994 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Building Code Council to adopt, amend, or update the International Building Code and the International Residential Code within two years of its official publication date. Clarifies that the Hawaii State Building Code acts as the interim county building code until superseded by the county. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Building Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2685) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-15-24 4:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-13-24 4:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
County Authority
Hawaii State Building Code
International Building Code
International Residential Code
Publication Date
Timeline
Hawaii State Building Code
International Building Code
International Residential Code
Publication Date
Timeline