HI SB2975 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the loss or theft of a firearm to be reported to the police within a certain time after discovery. Exempts persons who comply with the reporting requirement from the penalties for improper storage and other firearms violations.
Title
Lost or Stolen Firearms; Mandatory Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2975 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2975_.HTM |