HI SB2974 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the membership of the Advisory Committee on Pesticides to replace representatives from the sugar and pineapple industries with representatives of the coffee and diversified agriculture industries. Adds a representative of the Hawaii Farmers Union United to the Advisory Committee on Pesticides. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 81) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2836) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2600) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Advisory Committee on Pesticides
Coffee Industry
Diversified Agriculture Industry
Hawaii Farmers Union United
Pineapple Industry
Sugar Industry
Coffee Industry
Diversified Agriculture Industry
Hawaii Farmers Union United
Pineapple Industry
Sugar Industry