HI SB2967 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 784).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 784).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a new bargaining unit (14) for ocean safety officers and water safety officers employed by the State or counties effective July 1, 2030. (SB2967 HD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining; Ocean Safety Officers; Water Safety Officers; State and County Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 784). | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Senator(s) Kouchi added as conferee(s). | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Senator(s) Kim added as Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 2:45PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 757). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Aquino, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Cullen, Kawakami, Ward. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to LAB, PBM, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 533). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1532-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-30-12 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-30-12. | |
2012-03-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-12 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 52 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to LAB/PBM, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 375) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2661) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2337) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |