HI SB2955 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows permanent resident aliens to receive a permit to acquire a firearm. Requires the issuing authority for firearms permits to perform an inquiry on an applicant using the Criminal Justice Information System (CJIS), National Law Enforcement Telecommunications System (NLETS) including the Immigration and Customs Enforcement query in NLETS, National Crime Information Center (NCIC), and National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS). Adds permanent resident aliens to required background checks. Clarifies requirements for permanent resident aliens to obtain a firearms permit. Effective January 7, 2059. (SD1)
Title
Firearms; Background Checks; Permit; Permanent Resident Alien
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-18-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 314) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2676) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |