HI SB2949 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and distribution of sunscreen products containing ingredients not generally recognized as safe and effective as defined by the Food and Drug Administration.
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-04-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2949&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2949_.HTM |