HI SB2949 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the public utility commission from approving power purchase agreements that prohibit the sale of energy to third parties or agreements that require utility consent to sell energy to third parties.
Title
Power Purchase Agreements; Public Utilities Commission; Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TRE, CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2949&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2949_.HTM |