HI SB2926 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to study the potential tax revenues to be generated for the State through the legalization of recreational marijuana if it were taxed at a rate equal to the existing general excise tax rate. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Misalucha; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |