HI SB292 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB292
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on November 1, 2021, requires all vulnerable coastal property sales or transfers to include a sea level rise hazard exposure statement to ensure that new property owners and transferees understand the special hazards, requirements, and limitations that may affect the property. Requires sellers to include whether property is within a sea level rise exposure area in the disclosure statement provided to the buyer.
Title
Relating To Real Estate Disclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPN. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB431 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB292 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
SB292 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=292&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB292_.HTM |