HI HB431 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB431

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning on November 1, 2021, requires all vulnerable coastal property sales or transfers to include a sea level rise hazard exposure statement to ensure that new property owners and transferees understand the special hazards, requirements, and limitations that may affect the property. Requires sellers to include whether property is within a sea level rise exposure area in the disclosure statement provided to the buyer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Real Estate Disclosure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB292 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB431 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback