HI SB2909 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 124, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 124, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Legislative Reference Bureau to conduct a study that examines consolidating the law enforcement activities and responsibilities of various state divisions and agencies under a single, centralized state enforcement division or agency. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 124, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 124, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 131-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 131-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Nishimoto, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Taniguchi, K. Kahele, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 429. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 833). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Taniguchi, Nishihara, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 471). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1869-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1180-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 357) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Ihara, K. Rhoads . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Riviere, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2735) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO/JDC/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/JDC/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/JDC/PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2203 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Referred to GVO/JDC/PSM, WAM.