HI SB2902 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the authority of the director of transportation over required motor vehicle and motor carrier vehicle inspections in the State. (SB2902 HD2)
Title
Motor Vehicle Inspections; Motor Carrier Vehicle Inspections
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:30PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, McKelvey, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Evans, Har, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: English Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 631). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ohno voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1574-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, Fukumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from TRN/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Har, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Oshiro, Thielen. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Fukumoto. |
2014-03-17 | House | Re-referred to TRN/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by TRN/CPC on Wednesday, 03-19-14 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/CPC on Wednesday, 03-19-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2665) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2360) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TIA, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2352 (Same As) 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.