HI SB2902 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to assess the feasibility of landfill alternatives and landfill reuse.
Title
Community Landfills; Alternative Waste Methods; Landfill Reuse; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 3:10PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to ENE/HTH, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2902 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2902_.HTM |