HI SB29 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB29
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2021 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2021 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to require the State to plan for the production of enough housing to meet demand in its management of population growth. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Ix, Section 6, Of The Hawaii State Constitution, To Require The State And Its Political Subdivisions To Plan To Produce Enough Housing To Meet Demand In Their Management Of Population Growth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 29) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, English, Fevella, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Nishihara, Riviere . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-16-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB29 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.