HI SB2894 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies certain requirements regarding licensure of child care facilities, including exemptions from licensure, health and safety standards, and investigations of violations. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-07-10HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 633).
2020-07-10SenateSenate agrees with House amendments; passed Final Reading, as amended. Ayes, 25. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2020-07-08SenateDeferred One Day 07-10-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 410).
2020-07-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-07-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20.
2020-07-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1262-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-06-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
2020-06-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-06-24HouseRe-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 49
2020-03-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
2020-03-13HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2020-03-11HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to HSH, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 423) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3126) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:15PM in conference room 016.
2020-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-11SenateReported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella.
2020-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to HMS/CPH, JDC.
2020-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2338 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback