HI SB2888 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for appropriation funds to the department of transportation to plan, design, and construct the Paia bypass.
Title
Relating To The Paia Bypass.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2229) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2888&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2888_.HTM |