HI SB2886 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the State or any of its branches, political subdivisions, or agencies from requiring a bachelor's degree as a condition of eligibility for hire to a position in state employment. Establishes exemptions.
Title
Relating To State Employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT/GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2886&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2886_.HTM |