HI SB2884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the balance that may be retained in the public utilities commission special fund at the end of each fiscal year from $1,000,000 to $3,000,000. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Public Utilities Commission Special Fund Carryover Balance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Matsumoto. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 416) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3120) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2682) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2328 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9