HI SB2883 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that amendments to birth records that change parenthood shall not be conducted through the Uniform Information Practices Act procedures to correct personal records, but must be pursuant to a court order of appropriate jurisdiction or other legal establishment of parenthood.
Title
Amendments to Birth Certificates, Establishment of Parenthood
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 11:30am in conference room 329. |
2016-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 11:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-11-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 79). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2631) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Kim, Slom. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2131) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2354 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 4
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2883&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2883_.HTM |