HI SB288 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB288
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Department of the Attorney General. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050.
Title
Relating To The Department Of The Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB288 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.