HI SB2875 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 053, 4/28/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 053, 4/28/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition of the Endangered Species Recovery Committee by requiring inclusion of a member possessing a background in native Hawaiian traditional and customary practices. Describes ways in which background requirement may be met. (SB2875 HD1)
Title
Endangered Species Recovery Committee Membership; Native Hawaiian Traditional and Customary Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Act 053, 4/28/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153). |
2014-04-30 | House | Act 053, on 4/28/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-11 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 671). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-14. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-11-14. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-10-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Deferred until 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 432). |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-03-14. |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1379-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Nakashima, Wooley, McDermott. |
2014-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-27-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154-14), recommending referral to JUD. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-19 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 10:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) an Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Say, Thielen. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-10-14 8:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL, OMH, JUD, referral sheet 29 |
2014-02-28 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 47). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-27-14. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WTL/ENE/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, Taniguchi. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/ENE/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-14 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE/HWN. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2325 (Same As) 2014-02-12 - The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fale.