HI SB287 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all health insurers, including health benefits plans under chapter 87A, HRS, to disclose on, or have accessible through, their public web sites any medical policies used for making preauthorization decisions. (SB287 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
2017-03-24HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2017-03-23HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto.
2017-03-23HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-03-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-16HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (5).
2017-03-16HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2017-03-14HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro.
2017-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 114) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-03-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
2017-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to CPH.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB248 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback