HI SB2858 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an office of environmental information management within the department of health. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2858 HD1)
Title
Environmental Information Management Office
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:35PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Ruderman Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Say, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 622). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Har, McDermott, Tokioka voting no (6) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2014-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-03-14 2:05PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1046-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Fale; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-13-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 314) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Kahele . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2812) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2029) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to ENE, WAM.