HI SB2855 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an exception to the statutory requirement that overtime compensation be paid for work performed for certain State public work projects on Saturdays, Sundays, and State holidays. Specifically, when an applicable collective bargaining agreement permits, overtime compensation is not required for work performed on a Saturday of a week during which a condition or circumstance beyond the control of the contractor prevented workers from working for eight hours on one or more of the regularly scheduled Monday through Friday workdays, and the total hours of work performed on the project during the workweek by the worker has not exceeded forty hours. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Wage And Hours Of Employees On Public Works.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2358 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3