HI SB2854 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Vacated Encampment Clean Up Task Force to identify potential entities to enter into intergovernmental agreements to coordinate the clean up of vacated encampments located on lands managed by United States Army Garrison Hawaii. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2219) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HHS/PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2084 (Same As) 2024-03-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Clean Up
Expenditure Ceiling
Intergovernmental Agreements on Vacated Encampments Clean Up
Task Force
Vacated Encampments
Clean Up
Expenditure Ceiling
Intergovernmental Agreements on Vacated Encampments Clean Up
Task Force
Vacated Encampments