HI SB2854 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidates the five Island Burial Councils into a single Statewide Island Burial Council as a means to address long-standing quorum issues.
Title
Statewide Island Burial Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee on HWN deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-15-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee on HWN deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HWN, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2592 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to WLO/HAW, FIN, referral sheet 7
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2854 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2854_.htm |