HI SB2851 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Act 018, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes and the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Or Repealing Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes And The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, And Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateAct 018, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
2018-06-06HouseAct 018, on 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 65-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 65-18).
2018-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2018-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 329.
2018-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:30PM in conference room 329.
2018-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2018-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kim, Taniguchi.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, Thielen.
2018-04-12HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
2018-04-12SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 598).
2018-04-10HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6).
2018-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1882-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-03-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott.
2018-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 36
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 337) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-03-06SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-03-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2643) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to JDC.
2018-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2183 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 8

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback