HI SB2847 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to PSM/LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to PSM/LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the investigators of the Criminal Investigation Division, Narcotics Enforcement Division, Office of Homeland Security Division, Office of the Inspector General Division, and Sheriff Division of the Department of Law Enforcement who are subject to the statutory law enforcement standards for the state law enforcement officers from collective bargaining unit (13) into collective bargaining unit (14).
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2597 (Same As) 2024-02-02 - The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Bargaining Unit (13)
Bargaining Unit (14)
Department of Law Enforcement Collective Bargaining
Investigators
Bargaining Unit (14)
Department of Law Enforcement Collective Bargaining
Investigators
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2847&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2847_.HTM |