HI SB2842 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation from the general revenues of the State of Hawaii for fiscal year 2013-2014 to address the budget shortfall for the general support for health care payments program (HMS 902) in the Department of Human Services. (SD1)
Title
General Support for Health Care Payments (HMS 902); Emergency Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 306) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2682) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2075) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2292 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:45pm in Conference Room 016.