HI SB2841 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Act 031, 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Act 031, 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Confirms that employer contributions to the Employees' Retirement System may be made in advance or on a monthly basis.
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Employer Retirement Contributions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Act 031, 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131). |
2016-04-28 | House | Act 031, on 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131). |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 473). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1600-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6). |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-11-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 76). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2658) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:15PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2451) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2312 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2841&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2841_.HTM |