HI SB2835 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health insurance companies from denying coverage on the basis of gender identity if the policy covers the treatment for purposes other than gender transition. Requires insurance companies to provide applicants and insured persons with clear information about the coverage of gender transition services, including the process for appealing a claim denied on the basis of medical necessity. Takes effect 7/30/2075. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 358) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2945) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2312) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2405 (Same As) 2022-06-17 - Act 039, on 06/16/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).