HI SB2823 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Marumoto, Pine, Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Herkes, Mizuno excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Marumoto, Pine, Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Herkes, Mizuno excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the solid waste management surcharge to $1.25 per ton of solid waste disposed of in landfills or shipped out-of-state; increases the solid waste management surcharge to 60 cents per ton of solid waste disposed of at waste-to-energy facilities that accept 150,000 tons or more of solid waste annually; provides for no surcharges to waste-to-energy facilities that accept less than 150,000 tons of solid waste annually and for ash disposed of in landfills that originates from a waste-to-energy facility, and defines "waste-to-energy facility". Effective 07/01/50. (SD1)
Title
Solid Waste; Disposal Surcharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Marumoto, Pine, Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Herkes, Mizuno excused (4). | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Chang, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere, Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Herkes, Ito. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-15-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 328) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2749) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Ihara. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-16-12 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 2:55PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) Re-Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH/ENE, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2561 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 7