HI SB2806 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts the salary cap of the Superintendent of Education.
Title
Board of Education; Superintendent's Salary
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2313) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-14 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2257 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - Act 090, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).