HI SB2799 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 139, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 139, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the scope of practice of licensed dental hygienists in a public health setting. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Supervision Of Licensed Dental Hygienists In A Public Health Setting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 139, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 139, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours noticeTuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 18-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 18-18). |
2018-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ohno, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Tupola. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Tupola. |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 465). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-18. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1761-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2018-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1434-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ito, LoPresti, Ward. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1196-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-13 | House | Re-referred to HHS, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-15-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 315) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2532) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2372 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - Re-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 29