HI SB2793 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the chair of the Hawaiian Homes Commission, with unanimous consent of the Commission, to suspend administrative rules for the purpose of awarding a lease to a native Hawaiian who has been on the waitlist for at least twenty years. Repeals June 30, 2017. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2793 HD1)
Title
Hawaiian Homes Commission Act; Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3). | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Yamane, Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-14-12 8:45AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 312) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Fukunaga, Gabbard, Hee, Ige, Ihara, Kim, Nishihara, Ryan, Slom, Taniguchi, Tokuda . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2681) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-01-12 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HWN, JDL. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2531 (Same As) 2012-02-28 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.