HI SB2792 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Identifies and specifies the percentages of geothermal royalties and revenue from public land dispositions to nongeothermal renewable energy producers as supplemental sources of revenue for the Native Hawaiian Rehabilitation fund. Effective July 1, 2012. (SB2792 HD1)
Title
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands; Native Hawaiian Rehabilitation Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1029-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO/EEP. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Yamane, Pine. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-14-12 8:45AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Referred to HAW, WLO/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415) in amended form (SD 3). | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kidani, Ryan). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-12. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report filed. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Separated Committee Report. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 4 offered. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from HWN/WLH/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kahele, Slom. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/WLH/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-12 2:55PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HWN/WLH/ENE, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2530 (Same As) 2012-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4).